Global Patent Index - EP 1242580 A1

EP 1242580 A1 2002-09-25 - METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO SEMAPHORIN-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO SEMAPHORIN-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT SEMAPHORIN-ARTIGEN POLYPEPTIDEN UND POLYNUKLEOTIDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET SUBSTANCES RELATIFS A DES POLYPEPTIDES DE TYPE SEMAPHORINE ET A DES POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Publication

EP 1242580 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00989452 A

Priority

  • US 0035158 W
  • US 47127599 A
  • US 48872500 A
  • US 55231700 A
  • US 65327400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2395736A1] The present invention provides novel nucleic acids, novel polypeptide sequences encoded by these nucleic acids and uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/10; A61K 38/16; A61K 38/17; A61K 38/18; A61K 38/19; C07K 14/47; C07K 14/475; C07K 14/48; C07K 16/18; C07K 16/22; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/16; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/713 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/48 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/22 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/16 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12N 15/64 (2006.01); C12P 21/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

AU 2595501 A 20010731; AU 2596501 A 20010731; AU 2734801 A 20010731; AU 783303 B2 20051013; CA 2395736 A1 20010726; CA 2395763 A1 20010726; EP 1242580 A1 20020925; EP 1242580 A4 20030514; EP 1254256 A2 20021106; EP 1254256 A4 20050119

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2003-05-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI