Global Patent Index - EP 1242608 A2

EP 1242608 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD OF ACHIEVING PERSISTENT TRANSGENE EXPRESSION

Title (en)

METHOD OF ACHIEVING PERSISTENT TRANSGENE EXPRESSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERREICHUNG EINER PERSISTIERENDEN TRANSGENEXPRESSION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UNE EXPRESSION PERSISTANTE DE TRANSGENES

Publication

EP 1242608 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00991274 A

Priority

  • EP 0013297 W
  • US 47301899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148231A2] Non-inflammatory vector compositions are provided that are suitable for repeated transgene delivery and that result in persistent transgene expression. The compositions are non-inflammatory, the present compositions are suitable for readministration and do not induce expression-limiting immune or inflammatory responses. Thus, these compositions are useful in methods of repeated administration to achieve persistent transgene expression, and are especially suited to treating genetic, acquired and inflammation-associated conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86; A61K 48/00; A61P 19/02; A61P 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 9/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/573 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/24 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/99 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/00 (2013.01); A61K 38/55 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 38/55 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148231A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148231 A2 20010705; WO 0148231 A3 20020404; AU 3164801 A 20010709; CA 2395544 A1 20010705; CN 101011584 A 20070808; CN 1310679 C 20070418; CN 1433477 A 20030730; EP 1242608 A2 20020925; IL 150485 D0 20021201; JP 2003522133 A 20030722; NZ 531527 A 20051028

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030910

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI