Global Patent Index - EP 1242611 A2

EP 1242611 A2 2002-09-25 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INVOLVING AN ESSENTIAL STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS GENE AND ITS ENCODED PROTEIN

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INVOLVING AN ESSENTIAL STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS GENE AND ITS ENCODED PROTEIN

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ESSENTIELLEN STAPHYLOCOCUS AUREUS GENS UND DESSEN KODIERTEM PROTEIN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES CONCERNANT UN GENE ESSENTIEL DE STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS ET SA PROTEINE CODEE

Publication

EP 1242611 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00991434 A

Priority

  • US 0035180 W
  • US 47051299 A
  • US 68995200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146383A2] This invention relates to newly identified polynucleotides and polypeptides, their production and uses, as well as their variants, agonists and antagonists, and their uses. In particular, the invention relates to polynucleotides and polypeptides of a <i>Staphylococcus aureus (S. aureus)</i> DnaI related protein, as well as its variants. Also, the invention relates to a specific interaction between the <i>S. aureus</i> DnaI related protein or specific regions thereof, and a growth-inhibitory protein encoded by the <i>S. aureus</i> bacteriophage 77 genome. The phage protein interacts with amino acids 150 - 313 of <i>S. aureus</i> DnaI polypeptide, and the invention relates to the use of this interaction target site as the basis of drug screening assays. In addition, the invention relates to polynucleotides and polypeptides of a protein complex containing <i>S. aureus</i> DnaI and DnaC related proteins, as well as their variants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 21/06; C07K 14/00; C07K 16/00; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/31 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/18 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/70 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/31 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146383 A2 20010628; WO 0146383 A3 20020103; WO 0146383 A9 20020711; AU 3266201 A 20010703; AU 778782 B2 20041223; CA 2396674 A1 20010628; CA 2396674 C 20060704; EP 1242611 A2 20020925; EP 1242611 A4 20040811; JP 2003517833 A 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080206

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TARGANTA THERAPEUTICS INC.

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040628

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI