Global Patent Index - EP 1242613 A2

EP 1242613 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR KINETIC RESOLUTION OF RACEMATES OF ALCOHOLS OR CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR KINETIC RESOLUTION OF RACEMATES OF ALCOHOLS OR CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KINETISCHEN RACEMATSPALTUNG VON ALKOHOLEN ODER CARBONSÄUREESTERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SEPARATION RACEMIQUE CINETIQUE D'ALCOOLS OU D'ESTERS D'ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES

Publication

EP 1242613 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00990552 A

Priority

  • DE 0004536 W
  • DE 19963314 A
  • DE 19963315 A
  • DE 10006824 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144492A2] The invention relates to a method of kinetic resolution of racemates of alcohols or carboxylic acid esters. Fluorine phase marking of the quicker or more slowly reacting enantiomer is obtained by lipase-catalysed reaction of racemic alcohols with fluorinated carboxylic acid esters of racemic alcohols with water. The enantiomers are then extractively separated by division between an organic and a fluorine phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12P 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 41/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144492A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144492 A2 20010621; WO 0144492 A3 20020131; AU 3001101 A 20010625; EP 1242613 A2 20020925; US 2003003552 A1 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASCA GMBH ANGEWANDTE SYNTHESECHEMIE ADLERSHOF

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THEIL, FRITZ

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SONNENSCHEIN, HELMUT

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI