Global Patent Index - EP 1242641 A1

EP 1242641 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ALUMINUM-TITANIUM-BORON PREALLOY FOR USE AS A GRAIN REFINER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ALUMINUM-TITANIUM-BORON PREALLOY FOR USE AS A GRAIN REFINER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ALUMINIUM-TITAN-BOR-VORLEGIERUNG ALS KORNFEINUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PREALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM-TITANE-BORE EN TANT QUE MOYEN D'AFFINAGE DU GRAIN

Publication

EP 1242641 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00983193 A

Priority

  • EP 00983193 A
  • EP 0012015 W
  • EP 99811137 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142521A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a grain refiner on the basis of an aluminum-titanium-boron prealloy. According to the inventive method, starting materials that contain Ti and B are introduced into an aluminum melt while TiB2 particles are formed, and the prealloy melt produced is allowed to solidify. The prealloy is set in motion at a temperature between the liquidus temperature (T<L>Al3Ti) of the Al3Ti phase and the solidus temperature (T<S>V) of the prealloy for a period ( DELTA td) sufficient to disperse the TiB2 particles in the melt. The melt is simultaneously cooled off at a first rate of cooling (v1) so that the TiB2 particles function as the nuclei for the Al3Ti phase that is formed below the liquidus temperature (T<L>Al3Ti) and the surface of the TiB2 particles is at least partially covered by an Al3Ti coating. The prealloy is then cooled off to a temperature below the solidus temperature (T<S>V) of the prealloy at a second rate of cooling (v2) that is higher than the first rate of cooling (v1). The inventive method is especially useful in the production of grain refiners for the grain refinement of aluminum and aluminum alloys.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/02; C22C 1/03; C22C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/02 (2006.01); C22C 1/03 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/026 (2013.01); C22C 1/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142521A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142521 A1 20010614; WO 0142521 A8 20010712; CA 2394485 A1 20010614; DE 50005366 D1 20040325; EP 1114875 A1 20010711; EP 1242641 A1 20020925; EP 1242641 B1 20040218; US 2003075020 A1 20030424

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-11-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005366 P 20040325

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI TR

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI