Global Patent Index - EP 1242659 A1

EP 1242659 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND EXPELLING FOREIGN MATERIAL PRESENT IN A STREAM OF FIBRES CONSISTING OF COMPRESSED TEXTILE FIBRES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND EXPELLING FOREIGN MATERIAL PRESENT IN A STREAM OF FIBRES CONSISTING OF COMPRESSED TEXTILE FIBRES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERKENNEN UND AUSSCHLEUSEN VON FREMDMATERIAL IN EINEM FASERSTROM AUS VERDICHTETEN TEXTILEN FASERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR RECONNAITRE ET EVACUER UNE MATIERE ETRANGERE PRESENTE DANS UN FLUX DE FIBRES CONSTITUE DE FIBRES TEXTILES COMPRIMEES

Publication

EP 1242659 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00979313 A

Priority

  • CH 0000657 W
  • CH 230899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144545A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for identifying and expelling foreign material present in a stream of fibres consisting of compressed textile fibres. The aim of the invention is to create a method and a device for continuously inspecting the stream of fibres, even at high speeds, on an industrial scale under inspection conditions which remain constant over a long period of time. To this end, the stream of fibres is compressed in sections (62), driven by positive-fit, optically captured and inspected for the presence of foreign material. The device has at least one roller-shaped element (14, 15), provided with teeth (21, 22) which engage the stream of fibres. Light-conductive elements (23, 24) are arranged between said teeth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/46 (2006.01); D01G 9/16 (2006.01); D01G 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 31/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144545A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144545 A1 20010621; CN 1245546 C 20060315; CN 1411518 A 20030416; DE 50005738 D1 20040422; EP 1242659 A1 20020925; EP 1242659 B1 20040317; JP 2003517108 A 20030520; US 6848149 B1 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071206

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005738 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR