Global Patent Index - EP 1242678 A1

EP 1242678 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR BLEACHING PULP WITH CHLORINE DIOXIDE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR BLEACHING PULP WITH CHLORINE DIOXIDE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BLEICHEN VON PULPE DURCH CHLORDIOXYD

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE BLANCHIMENT DE LA PATE A PAPIER A L'AIDE DE BIOXYDE DE CHLORE

Publication

EP 1242678 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00956547 A

Priority

  • FI 0000724 W
  • FI 991815 A
  • FI 19991816 A
  • FI 19991817 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0114632A1] A method of treating pulp with chlorine dioxide according to which clorine dioxide is mixed in the pulp and the mixture thus produced is fed into a treatment vessel (42) in which the chlorine dioxide treatment is carried out at a temperature of 40-90 DEG C and at a pH of 1.5-6.5. The pulp is discharged from the treatment vessel in a closed space straight to a chlorine dioxide stage washer (44) ensuring that no detrimental amounts of residual dioxide remain in the pulp flowing to the washer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/02 (2006.01); D21C 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/02 (2013.01); D21C 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0114632A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FI FR PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0114632 A1 20010301; AU 6844800 A 20010319; BR 0013600 A 20020430; CA 2382866 A1 20010301; CA 2382866 C 20090120; EP 1242678 A1 20020925; EP 1242678 B1 20030917; EP 1242678 B9 20040609; ES 2204676 T3 20040501; PT 1242678 E 20031231

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-12 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-24 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20080416

2008-04-23 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080309

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: METSO FIBER KARLSTAD AB

- Effective date: 20040617

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-08-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KVAERNER PULPING TECHNOLOGIES AB

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204676 T3

2004-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FI FR PT SE

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ OY

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI