Global Patent Index - EP 1242704 A1

EP 1242704 A1 2002-09-25 - COMBINED MECHANICAL AND ELECTRONIC KEY, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE LOCKS OF MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

COMBINED MECHANICAL AND ELECTRONIC KEY, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE LOCKS OF MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

KOMBINIERTER MECHANISCHER UND ELEKTRONISCHER SCHLÜSSEL, INSBESONDERE FÜR AN FAHRZEUGEN BEFINDLICHE SCHLÖSSER

Title (fr)

CLE MECANIQUE ET ELECTRONIQUE COMBINEE, NOTAMMENT POUR DES SERRURES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1242704 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00993632 A

Priority

  • DE 19962975 A
  • EP 0011619 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148339A1] The invention relates to a combined mechanical and electronic key comprising a key housing for electronic components and an L-shaped flat key (30). Said flat key consists of a bearing limb (31) which enables the key to pivot into a storage position and a shank (32) which mechanically operates the lock. The shank (32) of the flat key (30) can be displaced between an inoperative position, retracted into the key housing and an operative position, in which it projects out of the housing. A push-button preferably also acts as the pivoting axis for the flat key (30). The push-button and the housing have profiled sections and the bearing limb has co-operating profiled sections (37, 38, 39), to subject the flat key (30) to a force in the operative position and to lock the key in one of its positions. The invention aims to produce a simple, cost-effective key. To this end, the flat key is configured as a planar plate (34) with an L-shaped outline, the shank (32) sharing the same plane as the bearing limb. The bearing limb (31) has an opening (35) in the plate for receiving, in a rotationally fixed manner, an insert (36) that has the co-operating profiled section (37 to 39).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/04; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/04 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00944 (2013.01); E05B 19/043 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00952 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7079 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7876 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8676 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148339A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148339 A1 20010705; AU 2836901 A 20010709; DE 19962975 A1 20010705; EP 1242704 A1 20020925; EP 1242704 B1 20050511; US 6705141 B1 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-20 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50010314

- Effective date: 20141002

2014-10-02 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50010314

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-08-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010314 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2004-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACOB, DIRK

2004-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, ULRICH

2004-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLATE, JEFFREY D.

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACOB, DIRK

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, ULRICH

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLATE, JEFFREY D.

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020427

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR