Global Patent Index - EP 1242706 A1

EP 1242706 A1 2002-09-25 - CLOSING DEVICE WITH A ROTOR WHICH HAS SPRING-LOADED LOCKING MECHANISMS IN A STATOR, ESPECIALLY FOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

CLOSING DEVICE WITH A ROTOR WHICH HAS SPRING-LOADED LOCKING MECHANISMS IN A STATOR, ESPECIALLY FOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM FEDERBELASTETE ZUHALTUNGEN AUFWEISENDEN ROTOR IN EINEM STATOR, INSBESONDERE FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE POURVU D'UN ROTOR PRESENTANT DES GACHETTES COMMANDEES PAR RESSORT DANS UN STATOR, NOTAMMENT POUR DES VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1242706 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00979501 A

Priority

  • DE 19953684 A
  • EP 0010194 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134925A1] The invention relates to a closing device (10) with a rotor (11) which has a cylindrical periphery (17) and which accommodates spring-loaded locking mechanisms on one side. With a closing device of this type, a pivoting tilting moment of the locking mechanisms may occur. A stator (21) for rotationally mounting the rotor (11) has a blocking channel (22) which is delimited by two flanks (23, 24) and into which the end of the spring-loaded locking mechanisms moves when the key is withdrawn, hereby preventing the rotor (11) from turning. Starting from a zero position, the rotor (11) can be moved into at least one other working position in two opposite directions (25, 26), respectively. The aim of the invention is to render the device more secure against break-in attempts by picking. To this end, there is a widened channel section (40) in the stator (21) on the flank (23) of the blocking channel (22) that is oriented in the direction of the tilting movement (25). Said widened channel section (40) has a larger inside width (41) than the rotor receiving element but is flatter than the radial depth (42) of the blocking channel (22). When the rotor (11) is moved into a rotation position in the direction of the tilting direction of the locking mechanism following manipulation, the locking mechanism rests on an inwardly pointing support surface provided inside the widened channel section (40) with its end. The locking mechanism therefore projects beyond the periphery of the rotor (11), hereby intercepting any rotation of the rotor (11) back (26) in the opposite direction of rotation from the other flank (24) of the blocking channel (22), resulting from further manipulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 29/00 (2006.01); E05B 29/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 29/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0134925A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134925 A1 20010517; WO 0134925 A8 20010614; AT 279624 T 20041015; AU 1696601 A 20010606; BR 0015417 A 20020702; CN 1390272 A 20030108; DE 19953684 A1 20010523; DE 19953684 C2 20020110; EP 1242706 A1 20020925; EP 1242706 B1 20041013; JP 2003514157 A 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121017

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121017

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HULSBECK & FURST G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. *HUF

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HUF HULSBECK & FURST G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20041013

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008272 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041017

2004-10-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041017

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI