Global Patent Index - EP 1242709 A1

EP 1242709 A1 2002-09-25 - PLASTIC FILLED OR HOLLOW CHAMBER PROFILES, ESPECIALLY FOR COMPOSITE PROFILES

Title (en)

PLASTIC FILLED OR HOLLOW CHAMBER PROFILES, ESPECIALLY FOR COMPOSITE PROFILES

Title (de)

VOLL- ODER HOHLKAMMERKUNSTSTOFFPROFILE, INSBESONDERE FÜR VERBUNDPROFILE

Title (fr)

PROFILES EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE, A CHAMBRE PLEINE OU CREUSE, NOTAMMENT POUR PROFILES COMPOSITES

Publication

EP 1242709 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00956430 A

Priority

  • DE 19962964 A
  • EP 0007820 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0148346A1] The aim of the invention is to improve known plastic filled or hollow chamber profiles, especially such as those used for absorbing tensile, bending or pressure loads, especially such as those used as insulating segments in composite profiles consisting of shaped metal parts, in such a way as to avoid the problems that are normally caused by the high filler content of the plastic material that is used. Said fillers are used to improve the expansion characteristics of the plastic. To this end, the plastic filled or hollow chamber profiles contain a surface layer consisting of a compact, non-porous first plastic material and in the core area, a fine-pored cellular structure consisting of a second plastic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/2632 (2013.01); E06B 3/26301 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26329 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26354 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26378 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1376 (2013.01); Y10T 428/233 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24744 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249976 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249979 (2015.04); Y10T 428/24998 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249986 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249988 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249989 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0148346A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0148346 A1 20010705; AT 329121 T 20060615; AU 6837600 A 20010709; CA 2395496 A1 20010705; CA 2395496 C 20081021; DE 19962964 A1 20010705; DE 50012939 D1 20060720; DK 1242709 T3 20060904; DK 1242709 T4 20100705; EP 1242709 A1 20020925; EP 1242709 B1 20060607; EP 1242709 B2 20100310; ES 2261231 T3 20061116; ES 2261231 T5 20100719; PL 203869 B1 20091130; PL 355653 A1 20040504; PT 1242709 E 20060929; US 2003035910 A1 20030220; US 6803083 B2 20041012

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140811

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012939

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2015-06-30 [PGRI BE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140812

2015-05-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150211

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140811

2015-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20100400959

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-03-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-02-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150211

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130812

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130812

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130812

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-19 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2010-07-05 [REG DK T4] AMENDED EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2010-06-02 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-05-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100400959

2010-03-23 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2010-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2010-03-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060811

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TECHNOFORM CAPRANO UND BRUNNHOFER GMBH & CO.KG

2007-04-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECHNOFORM CAPRANO UND BRUNNHOFER GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20070307

2007-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2261231 T3

2006-10-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060402926

2006-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060728

2006-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-04 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012939 P 20060720

2006-07-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENSINGER KUNSTSTOFFTECHNOLOGIE GBR

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENSINGER, WILFRIED

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENSINGER, WILFRIED

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENSINGER, WILFRIED

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI