Global Patent Index - EP 1242715 A1

EP 1242715 A1 2002-09-25 - LOCK ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

LOCK ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE

Publication

EP 1242715 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00985068 A

Priority

  • EP 00985068 A
  • EP 0011560 W
  • EP 99309153 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136784A1] A lock assembly (1) for locking an outer tubular element to an inner tubular element extending through the outer tubular element, the assembly comprising a lock mandrel (5) connected to one of said tubular elements and being provided with a recess facing the other one of said tubular elements, the recess (10) having at least one inwardly diverging side surface (12, 14), a lock member (34) arranged between the first and second tubular elements in a locking relationship with the other one of the tubular elements, the lock member extending into said recess and being operable between a retracted mode in which the lock member is movable relative to the recess and an expanded mode in which the lock member is expanded against the inwardly diverging side surface, the assembly further comprising an actuator means for expanding the lock member in said recess against said diverging side surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0136784A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136784 A1 20010525; AU 2160901 A 20010530; AU 766964 B2 20031030; BR 0015588 A 20020709; CA 2389618 A1 20010525; CA 2389618 C 20080916; CN 1191421 C 20050302; CN 1387602 A 20021225; DE 60019639 D1 20050525; DE 60019639 T2 20060302; EG 22362 A 20021231; EP 1242715 A1 20020925; EP 1242715 B1 20050420; MX PA02004816 A 20030128; NO 20022367 A 20020712; NO 20022367 D0 20020516; OA 12087 A 20060504; RU 2002115873 A 20040110; RU 2247221 C2 20050227

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091116

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019639 P 20050525

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI NL

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI