Global Patent Index - EP 1242730 A2

EP 1242730 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A FUEL PUMP

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A FUEL PUMP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER KRAFTSTOFFPUMPE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE POMPE A CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1242730 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00993427 A

Priority

  • DE 0004332 W
  • DE 19961298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144637A2] The invention relates to a method for controlling a fuel pump (11), especially an electric fuel pump used in an internal combustion engine. According to the inventive method, a fuel pump priming is initiated before the internal combustion engine itself is started. During control of the fuel pump (11) the control device of the internal combustion engine takes into consideration the fuel volume required or the fuel volume required to replenish the volume of the fuel supply system (19) or a corresponding fuel quantity or fuel mass and carries out a pump priming until the desired volume or the desired quantity or the desired mass that is determined depending on predetermined conditions has been delivered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/3082 (2013.01); F02D 41/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144637A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144637 A2 20010621; WO 0144637 A3 20020510; CN 1434899 A 20030806; DE 19961298 A1 20010621; EP 1242730 A2 20020925; JP 2003517135 A 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAMENFINK, WOLFGANG

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRASS, GERD

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEISS, RUEDIGER

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR