Global Patent Index - EP 1242731 A2

EP 1242731 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE DRIVE UNIT OF A VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE DRIVE UNIT OF A VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER ANTRIEBSEINHEIT EINES FAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ASSURER LA COMMANDE DE L'UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1242731 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00991070 A

Priority

  • DE 0004469 W
  • DE 19961291 A
  • DE 10016648 A
  • DE 10060298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144644A2] The invention relates to a method and device for controlling the drive unit of a vehicle. The invention provides that in addition to the default quantity for an output quantity of the drive unit, an additional specified quantity is provided, which represents the required dynamic adjustment of the output quantity. The adjusting quantity of the drive unit to be influenced is selected using the default quantity and the additional specified quantity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/10; B60K 41/04; F02D 37/02; F02D 41/04; F02D 41/14; F02D 41/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 5/15 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 31/00 (2006.01); F02D 37/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/0002 (2013.01); F02D 11/105 (2013.01); F02D 31/005 (2013.01); F02D 37/02 (2013.01); F02D 41/045 (2013.01); F02D 41/2422 (2013.01); F02D 41/2451 (2013.01); F02D 41/266 (2013.01); F02D 41/34 (2013.01); F02P 5/1504 (2013.01); Y02T 10/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144644A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144644 A2 20010621; WO 0144644 A3 20020328; WO 0144644 A8 20011122; CN 1265079 C 20060719; CN 1433503 A 20030730; EP 1242731 A2 20020925; JP 2003527518 A 20030916; RU 2002119203 A 20040120; RU 2264548 C2 20051120; US 2003098012 A1 20030529; US 6786197 B2 20040907

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060827

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILD, ERNST

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAISER, LILIAN

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NICOLAOU, MICHAEL

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HESS, WERNER

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JESSEN, HOLGER

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIND, WERNER

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR