Global Patent Index - EP 1242738 A1

EP 1242738 A1 2002-09-25 - REGULATION OF TRUE RUNNING FOR DIESEL ENGINES

Title (en)

REGULATION OF TRUE RUNNING FOR DIESEL ENGINES

Title (de)

RUNDLAUFREGELUNG FÜR DIESELMOTOREN

Title (fr)

REGULATION DE CONCENTRICITE POUR MOTEURS DIESEL

Publication

EP 1242738 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01993755 A

Priority

  • DE 10055192 A
  • EP 0112697 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0238936A1] The invention relates to a method for regulating true running. Particularly in the case of internal combustion engines which have many cylinders, the rotational speed proportions of the cylinders overlap in such a manner that, when viewing the rotational speed curve, it is no longer possible to make conclusions about the rotational speed proportions of the individual cylinders thus necessitating new evaluation methods. According to the invention, the contributions of the individual cylinders of the internal combustion engine to the rotational acceleration are determined on the basis of the behavior of the rotational speed of the crankshaft by individually deactivating the cylinders in succession. Using the rotational speed behavior curves that are obtained in such a manner, a pulse response spectrum (I) of a working cycle is formed at least for the harmonic of the 0.5<th> order. During normal operation, the rotational speed behavior of the crankshaft over the angle of each working cycle is then constantly recorded. The Fourier coefficients are appointed as resultant (R) of at least the harmonic of the 0.5<th> order by means of Fourier transformation. Correction factors for the injection quantities for equalizing the individual cylinders with regard to their rotational speed proportions are obtained by multiplying the components of resultants (R), said components being located in the direction of the pulse response vectors, with the pulse responses (I) and by adding them together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/0085 (2013.01); F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F02D 41/1498 (2013.01); F02D 41/0087 (2013.01); F02D 2041/288 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0238936A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0238936 A1 20020516; DE 10055192 A1 20020529; DE 10055192 C2 20021121; EP 1242738 A1 20020925; EP 1242738 B1 20030723; US 2003089338 A1 20030515; US 6820593 B2 20041123

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100412

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061102

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061102

2005-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-10-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100412 P 20030828

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR