Global Patent Index - EP 1242741 A1

EP 1242741 A1 2002-09-25 - DUAL-STAGE, PLUNGER-TYPE PISTON COMPRESSOR WITH MINIMAL VIBRATION

Title (en)

DUAL-STAGE, PLUNGER-TYPE PISTON COMPRESSOR WITH MINIMAL VIBRATION

Title (de)

SCHWINGUNGSARMER, ZWEISTUFIGER TAUCHKOLBENVERDICHTER

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR A PISTON PLONGEUR BI-ETAGE ET AVEC PEU DE VIBRATIONS

Publication

EP 1242741 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00991983 A

Priority

  • DE 19961646 A
  • EP 0012994 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146585A1] The invention relates to a piston arrangement for a dual-stage piston compressor, comprising a crankshaft and several cylinders which house the operating pistons. Said arrangement allows two or more low-pressure stages and at least one high-pressure stage to be formed. The invention is characterised in that the two or more low-pressure cylinders are arranged in relation to the high-pressure stage in such a way that said two or more low-pressure cylinders are in phase or are offset by less than +/- 15 DEG and compress in a position which is offset by 180 DEG +/- 20, in relation to one or more high-pressure cylinders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/02; F04B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 25/00 (2006.01); F04B 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/02 (2013.01); F04B 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146585A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146585 A1 20010628; WO 0146585 A9 20021107; AT 302906 T 20050915; AU 3726601 A 20010703; CN 1189658 C 20050216; CN 1413292 A 20030423; DE 19961646 C1 20011115; EP 1242741 A1 20020925; EP 1242741 B1 20050824; ES 2248168 T3 20060316; HK 1054776 A1 20050603; JP 2003519740 A 20030624; JP 4773022 B2 20110914; US 2003108435 A1 20030612; US 6776587 B2 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2248168 T3

2006-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060124

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-20 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051220

2005-11-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011039 P 20050929

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040910

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEYER, FRANK

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARTL, MICHAEL

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, STEFAN

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI