Global Patent Index - EP 1242817 A2

EP 1242817 A2 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING NEUROLOGICALLY RELEVANT PROPERTIES OF A MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING NEUROLOGICALLY RELEVANT PROPERTIES OF A MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG NEUROLOGISCH RELEVANTER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES MATERIALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'ETABLISSEMENT DE PROPRIETES D'UNE MATIERE PERTINENTES DU POINT DE VUE NEUROLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 1242817 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00987424 A

Priority

  • DE 19962263 A
  • EP 0013022 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146690A2] The invention relates to a method for establishing the neurologically relevant properties of a material, for which a nematode is used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/5085 (2013.01); G01N 2333/43534 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146690A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146690 A2 20010628; WO 0146690 A3 20020627; AU 2367201 A 20010703; DE 19962263 A1 20010712; EP 1242817 A2 20020925; US 2003108893 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100406

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071012

2005-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS PHARMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI