Global Patent Index - EP 1242856 A2

EP 1242856 A2 2002-09-25 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SIMULTANEOUS DISPLAY OF MULTIPLE INFORMATION SOURCES

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SIMULTANEOUS DISPLAY OF MULTIPLE INFORMATION SOURCES

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SIMULTANEN ANZEIGE VON INFORMATION AUS EINE VIELZAHL VON QUELLEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE SIMULTANE DE MULTIPLES SOURCES D'INFORMATIONS

Publication

EP 1242856 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00989192 A

Priority

  • US 0029850 W
  • US 16252299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0131416A2] A computerized method of presenting information from a variety of sources (10-90) on a display device (110). Specifically the present invention (Fig. 2) describes a graphical user interface (126) for organizing the simultaneous display of information from a multitude of information sources (10-90). In particular, the present invention comprises a graphical user interface (126) which organizes content from a variety of information sources into a grid (1) of tiles (10-90), each of which can refresh its content independently of the others. The grid (1) functionality manages the refresh rates of the multiple information sources. The present invention is intended to operate in a plateform independent manner.

[origin: WO0131416A2] A computerized method of presenting information from a variety of sources on a display device. Specifically the present invention describes a graphical user interface for organizing the simultaneous display of information from a multitude of information sources. In particular, the present invention comprises a graphical user interface which organizes content from a variety of information sources into a grid of tiles, each of which can refresh its content independently of the others. The grid functionality manages the refresh rates of the multiple information sources. The present invention is intended to operate in a plateform independent manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G06F 3/048 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01); G09G 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/14 (2013.01); G09G 2310/04 (2013.01); G09G 2370/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0131416 A2 20010503; WO 0131416 A3 20020131; AU 2573301 A 20010508; CA 2387933 A1 20010530; EP 1242856 A2 20020925; EP 1242856 A4 20080604; IL 149090 D0 20021110; JP 2003513350 A 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100504

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090129

2008-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080507

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANTORO, OVID

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAGERMANN, KLAUS

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI