Global Patent Index - EP 1242870 A1

EP 1242870 A1 2002-09-25 - A PROXIMITY-BASED REDIRECTION SYSTEM FOR ROBUST AND SCALABLE SERVICE-NODE LOCATION IN AN INTERNETWORK

Title (en)

A PROXIMITY-BASED REDIRECTION SYSTEM FOR ROBUST AND SCALABLE SERVICE-NODE LOCATION IN AN INTERNETWORK

Title (de)

NÄHERUNGSBASIERTES UMLEITUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ROBUSTE UND SKALIERBARE SERVICE-NODE LOCATION IN INTERNET-NETZWERK

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REACHEMINEMENT DE DONNEES BASE SUR LA PROXIMITE PERMETTANT D'IMPLANTER UN NOEUD DE SERVICES A ARCHITECTURE ROBUSTE ET EVOLUTIVE DANS UN RESEAU INTERNET

Publication

EP 1242870 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00961467 A

Priority

  • US 0024047 W
  • US 15225799 P
  • US 45821699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0118641A1] A proximity-oriented redirection system for service-to-client attachment in a virtual overlay distribution network (300). The virtual overlay distribution network (300) includes addressable routers (R1-R6) for routing packet traffic, wherein a packet of data is routed from a source node (C1) to a destination node (C2) based on address fields of the packet. The invention includes a redirector (S1, S2) coupled to at least one of the addressable routers (R3, R4) and includes: logic for accepting a service request from a client (312); logic for determining a selected server for handling the service request, the selected server being one of a plurality of servers that can handle the service request; and logic for generating a redirection message directed to the client for redirecting the service request to the selected server.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/00; G06F 15/173

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/18 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 45/22 (2013.01); H04L 45/306 (2013.01); H04L 67/1002 (2013.01); H04L 67/1008 (2013.01); H04L 67/101 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); H04L 67/1029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0118641 A1 20010315; AU 7341500 A 20010410; AU 771353 B2 20040318; EP 1242870 A1 20020925; EP 1242870 A4 20050406; JP 2003508996 A 20030304; JP 3807981 B2 20060809; US 2003105865 A1 20030605; US 6415323 B1 20020702; US 6901445 B2 20050531

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150717

2015-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOOGLE INC.

2008-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080312

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAHOO! INC.

2005-04-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050223

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCCANNE, STEVEN

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DESTEIN, WILLIAM, C.

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI