Global Patent Index - EP 1242904 A1

EP 1242904 A1 2002-09-25 - SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING TRANSACTIONS ON AN EXCHANGE

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING TRANSACTIONS ON AN EXCHANGE

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM ERLEICHTERN TRANSAKTIONEN VON EINEM AUSTAUSCH

Title (fr)

SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE FACILITER LES TRANSACTIONS SUR UN CENTRAL DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1242904 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00972993 A

Priority

  • GB 0004180 W
  • US 16962099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142949A2] A broker-to-broker system enables originating brokers to send orders for execution to fulfilling brokers using broker-to-broker system secure networks and systems and for the resulting transactions to be cleared and settled in the name of the two parties using broker-to-broker system to manage the process. Locale-specific format conversions, such as for securities numbers, language, and currencies, are automatically performed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142949 A2 20010614; WO 0142949 A8 20020103; AU 1155001 A 20010618; EP 1242904 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090501

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRADEWARE GLOBAL HOLDINGS, LLC

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020713

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI