Global Patent Index - EP 1242906 A2

EP 1242906 A2 2002-09-25 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VIRTUAL RENTAL FLEET, MODELING A SIMULATED FLEET OF ASSETS AND DISPOSING OF ASSETS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VIRTUAL RENTAL FLEET, MODELING A SIMULATED FLEET OF ASSETS AND DISPOSING OF ASSETS

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINEN VIRTUELLEN MIETFUHRPARK, FÜR DIE BILDUNG EINES SIMULIERTEN FUHRPARKMODELLS UND FÜR DIE VERÄUSSERUNG VON BETRIEBSMITTELN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE LOCATION VIRTUELLE D'UNE FLOTTE DE BIENS, LA MODELISATION D'UNE FLOTTE DE BIENS SIMULEE ET LA MISE A DISPOSITION DE CES BIENS

Publication

EP 1242906 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00978701 A

Priority

  • US 0031426 W
  • US 44128999 A
  • US 16604299 P
  • US 50367100 A
  • US 50400000 A
  • US 50434300 A
  • US 65373500 A
  • US 70236300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0137121A2] A computer based system automatically gathers, analyzes, and delivers information relating to the procurement and utilization of a plurality of such assets, such as a fleet of industrial equipment, so as to maximize productivity and to reduce operating costs and administrative burdens. Each of the assets is preferably provided with a data acquisition device for sensing and storing one or more operating characteristics associated therewith. That information can be transmitted through space to a receiver connected to a local controller for storing such information and for transmitting such information to a remote analysis system. The remote analysis system automatically updates individual records associated with each of the assets with the information received. In response to such information, the remote analysis system automatically analyzes the newly provided information and schedules maintenance as required. Information associated with the maintenance is also recorded electronically to maximize efficiency, provide historical trends, automate billing, and control inventory levels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/06 (2013.01); G06Q 30/06 (2013.01); Y02P 90/86 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0137121 A2 20010525; WO 0137121 A8 20020906; AU 1613301 A 20010530; AU 1770701 A 20010530; EP 1242906 A2 20020925; EP 1259889 A2 20021127; WO 0137118 A2 20010525; WO 0137118 A8 20020725

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-12-12 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020612

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB LI

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUHY, ANDY, F.

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARENT, BRENT, C.

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROTH, AARON, J.

2002-12-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: O'BRIEN, PATRICK

2002-10-02 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI