Global Patent Index - EP 1242936 A1

EP 1242936 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR GENERATING AND USING IDENTIFIER DATA

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERATING AND USING IDENTIFIER DATA

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR GENERIERUNG UND BENUTZUNG VON IDENTIFIER-DATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION DE DONNEES D'IDENTIFICATEUR

Publication

EP 1242936 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00956544 A

Priority

  • FI 0000721 W
  • FI 19991809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0115027A1] The invention relates to a method for generating and using identifier data. The method is characterized in that an identifier means (1) is used which is the existing identifier means (1) administered by a user (3), a connection restricted in time is made at a server (7) between the identifier data (2) arranged into the identifier means and data located separate from the identifier means (1), the connection providing the user (3) of the identifier means (1) with a specific right which is interpreted and confirmed on the basis of the identifier data (2) arranged into the identifier means (1). The connection between the identifier data (2) arranged into the identifier means (1) and the data located separate from the identifier means (1) is made and transferred using a telecommunications network (8), such as the Internet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 21/62 (2013.01); G07B 15/00 (2011.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06F 21/6218 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/40145 (2013.01); G07B 15/00 (2013.01); G06F 2221/2153 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0115027A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0115027 A1 20010301; AU 6844500 A 20010319; EP 1242936 A1 20020925; FI 111484 B 20030731; FI 19991809 A 20010226; SE 0200528 D0 20020222; SE 0200528 L 20020326; SE 520574 C2 20030729

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0017600000

- IPC: G06Q0010000000

- Effective date: 20150324

2015-03-24 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0017600000

- IPC: G06Q0010000000

2015-03-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20141026

2014-10-26 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070102

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI LI

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI