Global Patent Index - EP 1242952 A1

EP 1242952 A1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANDATORY ARBITRATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANDATORY ARBITRATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OBLIGATORISCHEN ARBITRIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ARBITRAGE OBLIGATOIRE

Publication

EP 1242952 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00982431 A

Priority

  • US 0032970 W
  • US 46174299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145006A1] A method and system for arbitration resolution. The present invention provides for party (310) and document registration (340), a billing component (370) and a state specific language database (320).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145006 A1 20010621; AU 1946301 A 20010625; CA 2431934 A1 20010621; EP 1242952 A1 20020925; EP 1242952 A4 20030402

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [R18R] REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-11-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050111

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-04-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI