Global Patent Index - EP 1242955 A2

EP 1242955 A2 2002-09-25 - VIRTUAL BANK

Title (en)

VIRTUAL BANK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN IDENTIFIKATION EINER KONTONUMMER EINES ANRUFERS BEI EINEM RECHNER EINER BANK

Title (fr)

BANQUE VIRTUELLE

Publication

EP 1242955 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00987137 A

Priority

  • DE 0004030 W
  • DE 19964080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0150360A2] According to the invention, an efficient, error-resistant and manipulation-proof identification of an account number and/or of a caller can be carried out by a device and a method for automatically identifying an account number of a caller and/or the caller when the caller (1) initiates a dialing-in to or an account transaction (9) in a computer of a bank (5) via a telecommunications medium (3). The telephone number of the caller (1) is conveyed over the telecommunications medium (2, 3), whereby the account number of the caller (1) and/or the caller is identified based on the telephone number that at least partial corresponds thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/00 (2012.01); H04M 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/02 (2013.01); H04M 3/38 (2013.01); H04M 3/42059 (2013.01); H04M 2207/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150360A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0150360 A2 20010712; WO 0150360 A3 20020425; AU 2349901 A 20010716; DE 19964080 A1 20011213; EP 1242955 A2 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20071126

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040308

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GERARD, PETER

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI