Global Patent Index - EP 1242960 A4

EP 1242960 A4 2002-09-25 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING COMPLETE NON-JUDICIAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT AND OPERATION

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING COMPLETE NON-JUDICIAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT AND OPERATION

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VOLLIGEM NICHT-JURISTISCHEM ANFECHTUNGSAUFLöSUNGSVERWALTUNG UND -DURCHFüHRUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION ET DE MISE EN OEUVRE COMPLETES DE RESOLUTION NON JUDICIAIRE DE LITIGES

Publication

EP 1242960 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00935938 A

Priority

  • US 0013111 W
  • US 13344199 P
  • US 14165099 P
  • US 14515899 P
  • US 14667799 P
  • US 15616999 P
  • US 17713300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0068865A1] A system (1) and method for providing complete non-judicial dispute resolution management and operation. The system includes an electronic architecture (3) which receives, sorts, and stores data related to non-judicial dispute resolution. The architecture enables implementation and management between two or more adverse parties (UT1, ..., UTn) to a dispute. The system is accessible electronically by wired and/or wireless communication. The architecture includes a management module configured to receive, sort and store dispute resolution data to provide an internal continuous compilation of such data and new data generated during the resolution procedures. The architecture also includes a reckoning module connected to the management module for receipt of dispute resolution data. The reckoning module is designed to implement a selected resolution procedure and to transmit to the management new data generated during the resolution procedure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5692206 A 19971125 - SHIRLEY ROBERT BRYCE [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9837655 A1 19980827 - FINANCIAL SERVICES TECHNOLOGY [US]
  • [PX] WO 0008582 A1 20000217 - CYBER DOLLAR ETTLE COM INC [US]
  • [E] WO 0221257 A1 20020314 - BTG INT LTD [GB], et al
  • [XA] DEEDMAN C ET AL: "SLATE: specialized legal automated term extraction", DEXA 92. DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, PROCEEDINGS OF DEXA '92. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, VALENCIA, SPAIN, 2-4 SEPT. 1992, 1992, Wien, Austria, Springer-Verlag, Austria, pages 133 - 137, XP002207778, ISBN: 3-211-82400-6
  • See also references of WO 0068865A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0068865 A1 20001116; AU 5132300 A 20001121; AU 771486 B2 20040325; BR 0010506 A 20020213; CA 2373168 A1 20001116; CN 1352777 A 20020605; EP 1242960 A1 20020925; EP 1242960 A4 20020925; JP 2002544601 A 20021224; MX PA01011412 A 20100602

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NATIONAL ARBITRATION AND MEDITATION, INC.

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE