Global Patent Index - EP 1242981 A1

EP 1242981 A1 2002-09-25 - DISTRIBUTION OF CERTIFIERS

Title (en)

DISTRIBUTION OF CERTIFIERS

Title (de)

VERTEILEN VON ZERTIFIKATEN

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTION DE CERTIFICATEURS

Publication

EP 1242981 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00967940 A

Priority

  • FI 0000874 W
  • FI 19992197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0127886A1] The method in accordance with the invention makes it possible to attach a certificate to a private key using the encryption method of the private and public key stored on a subscriber identity module. The end user makes a service initialisation request which is transmitted to a trust manager operating in the network. The manager verifies the identity of the user and authenticates the subscriber identity module used by the user, and based on it, sends a certification request further on to a certification authority. In case a certificate is issued, it is transmitted to the database of a local service provider, or a public certification database in both of which it is further available, if the end user wishes to use it in a service. In this way, all that the end user has to do is to make a service initialisation request, and after that, he or she has the certificate relating to the service at his or her disposal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10; H04L 9/32; H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/3829 (2013.01); G06Q 20/02 (2013.01); G06Q 20/32 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3229 (2013.01); G06Q 20/38215 (2013.01); H04L 9/3234 (2013.01); H04L 9/3263 (2013.01); H04L 9/3297 (2013.01); H04L 2209/56 (2013.01); H04L 2209/80 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0127886A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0127886 A1 20010419; AU 7792900 A 20010423; CN 1139902 C 20040225; CN 1379893 A 20021113; EP 1242981 A1 20020925; FI 19992197 A 20010430

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070821

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070410

2004-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMARTTRUST SYSTEMS OY

2004-09-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI LI

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI