Global Patent Index - EP 1243007 A1

EP 1243007 A1 2002-09-25 - ACTUATOR MECHANISM

Title (en)

ACTUATOR MECHANISM

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1243007 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00971418 A

Priority

  • DE 19961978 A
  • EP 0010868 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146970A1] The invention relates to an actuator mechanism, especially for actuation by means of a solenoid. The inventive mechanism comprises an adjustable part (magnetic return plate (7)) fixed to the housing (1) by a return spring (17), and a stationary part (magnet core (3)). The return spring (17) is held on a pin (8) and the adjustable part (magnetic return plate (7)) is linked with said pin (8). The pin (8) is provided with a shoulder (11). The return spring (17) is braced between the shoulder (11) and a spring (18) that rests on the adjustable part. In the non-actuated state, there is a precisely defined basic air gap (19) between the adjustable part and the stationary part. The shoulder (11) can be adjusted on the pin (8). To this end, the adjustable shoulder (11) is configured as a nut that can be adjusted via a thread (20) disposed on the pin (8). The nut can be replaced by an adequately fixable adjusting element, for example, a pressed-on ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146970A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146970 A1 20010628; BR 0016522 A 20020924; CN 1379906 A 20021113; DE 19961978 A1 20010705; DE 50012266 D1 20060427; EP 1243007 A1 20020925; EP 1243007 B1 20060222; ES 2259292 T3 20061001; JP 2003529208 A 20030930; US 6683519 B1 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012266

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2259292 T3

2006-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-06-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012266 P 20060427

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2005-06-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR