Global Patent Index - EP 1243011 A1

EP 1243011 A1 2002-09-25 - CONTACTOR WITH A FRONT MASK

Title (en)

CONTACTOR WITH A FRONT MASK

Title (de)

SCHUTZ MIT FRONTMASKE

Title (fr)

CONTACTEUR A MASQUE FRONTAL

Publication

EP 1243011 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00993754 A

Priority

  • FR 0003688 W
  • FR 9916805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2803429A1] The invention relates to an electromechanical contactor, comprising a mobile push-piece which is connected to the contact support and can be accessed via a front face. A cover in the form of a plate is removably mounted on the front part (10a) of the housing (10), on fastening elements (17, 19) provided for mounting an additional bloc. Said cover provides a means of masking the mobile push-piece (16) and has a transparent section (21) in front of the push-piece which prevents it from being activated manually without altering the ability of the device to display the state of the contactor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/02; H01H 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 9/28 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/06 (2006.01); H01H 50/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/326 (2013.01); H01H 9/287 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150489A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2803429 A1 20010706; FR 2803429 B1 20020412; AU 2859501 A 20010716; DE 60003946 D1 20030821; DE 60003946 T2 20040212; EP 1243011 A1 20020925; EP 1243011 B1 20030716; ES 2199899 T3 20040301; JP 2003519887 A 20030624; JP 4454903 B2 20100421; US 2002192990 A1 20021219; US 6664488 B2 20031216; WO 0150489 A1 20010712

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161226

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161226

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199899 T3

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003946 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALEXANDRE, PASCAL

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PERROCHEAU, REGIS

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI