Global Patent Index - EP 1243022 A2

EP 1243022 A2 2002-09-25 - THIN-FILM RESISTOR WITH HIGH TEMPERATURE COEFFICIENT FOR USE AS PASSIVE SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUITS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

THIN-FILM RESISTOR WITH HIGH TEMPERATURE COEFFICIENT FOR USE AS PASSIVE SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUITS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

DÜNNSCHICHTWIDERSTAND MIT HOHEM TEMPERATURKOEFFIZIENTEN ALS PASSIVES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT FÜR INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

RESISTANCE A COUCHE MINCE A COEFFICIENT DE TEMPERATURE ELEVE EN TANT QUE COMPOSANT PASSIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR POUR DES CIRCUITS INTEGRES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LADITE RESISTANCE

Publication

EP 1243022 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00993458 A

Priority

  • DE 0004320 W
  • DE 19961180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145151A2] The invention relates to a semiconductor component with a WSiN layer as the thin-film resistor with high temperature coefficient for use as thermistor in bolometers. The production method comprises the thermal decoupling by means of thermistors that are self-contained or disposed on an insulation layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/316; G01J 5/20; H01L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 5/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 28/24 (2013.01); G01J 5/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145151A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145151 A2 20010621; WO 0145151 A3 20020214; DE 19961180 A1 20010628; DE 19961180 C2 20020228; EP 1243022 A2 20020925; US 2002192853 A1 20021219; US 6884690 B2 20050426

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080805

2007-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNITED MONOLITHIC SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061218

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR