Global Patent Index - EP 1243095 A1

EP 1243095 A1 2002-09-25 - SPACE-TIME CODE DESIGN FOR FADING CHANNELS

Title (en)

SPACE-TIME CODE DESIGN FOR FADING CHANNELS

Title (de)

RAUM-ZEIT-KODE ENTWURF FÜR SCHWUNDKANÄLE

Title (fr)

MODELE DE CODE SPATIO-TEMPOREL POUR CANAUX A EVANOUISSEMENT

Publication

EP 1243095 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00983956 A

Priority

  • US 0033074 W
  • US 47421599 A
  • US 47418499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0150671A1] A method, and associated apparatus, for a sending station operable in a communication system, such as a cellular communication system. A codeword is formed which, when transmitted upon a channel, exhibits a selective level of space and time diversity. A TCM (Trellis Coded Modulation) scheme is provided for a multiple-antenna transmitter which accommodates transmit diversity by way of the multiple antennas without requiring the need to utilize multiple Trellis Coded Modulation techniques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/06 (2006.01); H04L 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/006 (2013.01); H04L 1/0618 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150671A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0150671 A1 20010712; AU 2064101 A 20010716; EP 1243095 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120329

2012-03-29 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061115

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI