Global Patent Index - EP 1243157 A1

EP 1243157 A1 2002-09-25 - MANAGING SUBSCRIBER INFORMATION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK

Title (en)

MANAGING SUBSCRIBER INFORMATION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK

Title (de)

VERWALTUNG VON TEILNEHMERINFORMATION IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ

Title (fr)

GESTION DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES AUX ABONNES DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE

Publication

EP 1243157 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00988845 A

Priority

  • FI 0001156 W
  • FI 19992806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0150801A1] A method of registering subscribers in a mobile communication system comprising a home location register for at least partly storing static subscriber information and dynamic subscriber information on the subscribers in the mobile communication system and at least a first visitor location register communicating with the home location register for storing the static subscriber information and the dynamic subscriber information on the subscribers registered in said visitor location register. When a registration of the subscriber is removed from the visitor location register, the visitor location register is arranged to retain the stored static subscriber information on the subscriber and to update the removal of the registration in the dynamic subscriber information on the subscriber. When the subscriber is registered, the visitor location register receives a registration message of the subscriber, checks whether the static subscriber information on the subscriber is found in the visitor location register, asks the home location register for the static subscriber information on the subscriber if the static subscriber information is found in the first visitor location register, and registers the subscriber in the visitor location register if the static subscriber information on the subscriber does not prevent the registration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 8/06 (2009.01); H04W 8/12 (2009.01); H04W 60/06 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 8/06 (2013.01); H04W 8/12 (2013.01); H04W 60/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150801A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0150801 A1 20010712; AU 2520201 A 20010716; EP 1243157 A1 20020925; FI 19992806 A 20010630

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 8/06 20090101AFI20091102BHEP

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060217

2005-12-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS SECURE NETWORKS OY

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI