Global Patent Index - EP 1243176 A2

EP 1243176 A2 2002-09-25 - Roof ridge ventilating system for the ventilation of animal houses

Title (en)

Roof ridge ventilating system for the ventilation of animal houses

Title (de)

Firstentlüftungsvorrichtung für die Stallentlüftung

Title (fr)

Système d'aération de faîtage pour la ventilation des étables

Publication

EP 1243176 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006278 A

Priority

DE 20105085 U

Abstract (en)

The roof ridge ventilation unit for stables comprises cover elements (9, 10) which are shaped and arranged so that in their open position a vertical exit opening (19) is provided for rising stable air.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Firstentlüftungsvorrichtung für die Stallentlüftung mit einer durch mindestens ein Abdeckteil verschließbaren Entlüftungsöffnung ist das Abdeckteil derart angeordnet und ausgebildet, dass es in Öffnungsstellung eine vertikal nach oben freie Entlüftungsöffnung für einen im wesentlichen umlenkfreien vertikalen Luftaustritt der Stallluft nach oben hin bildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 1/00; F24F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/163 (2013.01); F24F 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20105085 U1 20010607; AT 327666 T 20060615; DE 50206948 D1 20060706; EP 1243176 A2 20020925; EP 1243176 A3 20050119; EP 1243176 B1 20060531

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SONNTAG GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 327666 T

- Effective date: 20160420

2015-06-10 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-03-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SONNTAG GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HIENLE, FRANZ, 86879 WIEDERGELTINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50206948

- Effective date: 20150205

2015-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50206948

- Representative's name: BOCKHORNI & KOLLEGEN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20150205

2015-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG, CH

2015-02-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SONNTAG GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HIENLE, FRANZ, DE

2015-02-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50206948

- Representative's name: BOCKHORNI & KOLLEGEN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206948 P 20060706

2006-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: URS WEGMANN DIPL.-ING.

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050214

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI