Global Patent Index - EP 1243188 A1

EP 1243188 A1 2002-09-25 - Lining pad for a brassiere

Title (en)

Lining pad for a brassiere

Title (de)

Büstenhalterkisseneinlage

Title (fr)

Doublure-coussinet pour brassière

Publication

EP 1243188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01106873 A

Priority

EP 01106873 A

Abstract (en)

A lining pad for a brassiere provides an external layer and an internal layer, which are made of elastic foamed material and have a shape corresponding to a bra cup of the brassiere respectively. An intermediate layer is sandwiched between the external and the internal layers and not corresponding to a breast so as to constitute a support part with relatively less elasticity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/144 (2013.01); A41C 3/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243188 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041013

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI