Global Patent Index - EP 1243194 A2

EP 1243194 A2 2002-09-25 - Bracelet fastener

Title (en)

Bracelet fastener

Title (de)

Armbandverschluss

Title (fr)

Attache de bracelet

Publication

EP 1243194 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02405213 A

Priority

CH 5212001 A

Abstract (en)

The closure for a watch bracelet has a hook (10) and a cylindrical bar (12). The hook has a lock (14) which is cylindrical to rotate about an axis (A-A) and having a groove (16) extending radially at its periphery as far as the pivot axis to receive the bar. A support (22) has the lock mounted for free rotation on it, also having a groove to receive the bar. The lock has cut outs to receive pegs (36) on the support.

Abstract (fr)

Attache de bracelet, comportant une pièce d'accrochage (10) et un barreau (12) destinés à être fixés l'un à l'autre de manière amovible, dans laquelle le barreau (12) est de forme générale cylindrique. La pièce d'accrochage (10) comporte: un verrou (14) présentant une forme générale cylindrique, agencé de manière à pouvoir tourner autour d'un axe de pivotement (A-A) et muni d'une fente (16) s'entendant radialement de sa périphérie jusqu'au-delà l'axe de pivotement (A-A) et dans laquelle le barreau (12) peut être engagé, un support (22) sur lequel le verrou (14) est monté mobile en rotation, également muni d'une fente (30) dans laquelle le barreau (12) peut être engagé, et des moyens de liaison du support au verrou, Dans cette attache, les moyens de liaison comprennent deux découpes (18), de section en secteur annulaire, pratiquées dans le verrou (14) et orientées parallèlement à l'axe (A-A), et deux goupilles (36) solidaires du support (22) et engagées dans les découpes (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/20; A44C 5/00; G04B 37/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/2033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243194 A2 20020925; EP 1243194 A3 20040102

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-10-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44C 5/20 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44C 5/00 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 04B 37/14 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI