Global Patent Index - EP 1243195 A2

EP 1243195 A2 2002-09-25 - Ring

Title (en)

Ring

Title (de)

Schmuckring

Title (fr)

Bague

Publication

EP 1243195 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450065 A

Priority

AT 20601 U

Abstract (en)

The ring (1) has a disk (2) on top with a peripheral collar. This allows a crown cork (3) to be fitted as an ornament.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schmuckring mit einem zum Überstreifen auf einen Finger bestimmten Reif (1) weist einen damit verbundenen Träger (2) für schmückendes Beiwerk (3) auf. Der Träger (2) ist dabei zur auswechselbaren Aufnahme des schmückenden Beiwerkes (3) ausgebildet. Insbesondere ist der Träger (2) mit einem außen umlaufenden Wulst (4) zur Aufnahme eines Kronenkorkens (3) ausgebildet. Dadurch wird ein vielseitig verwendbarer Schmuckring geschaffen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 9/00; A44C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 9/00 (2006.01); A44C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/02 (2013.01); A44C 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243195 A2 20020925; EP 1243195 A3 20040102; AT 5246 U1 20020527

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070307

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI