Global Patent Index - EP 1243199 A1

EP 1243199 A1 2002-09-25 - Test sample

Title (en)

Test sample

Title (de)

Testprobe

Title (fr)

Echantillon de test

Publication

EP 1243199 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290653 A

Priority

FR 0103886 A

Abstract (en)

The test sample for scent has a casing (25) with an opening section (23) which is sealed before use. There is a support (4) to receive a fluid. The support is positioned in the case to allow extraction after opening. The support can be a material which absorbs the scent and which is fixed to the opening section. The casing can be heat sealed for closure.

Abstract (fr)

Echantillon de test de parfum destiné à être humé, caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend : un étui (25) présentant une partie d'ouverture (23), ledit étui (25) étant scellé avant utilisation, et un élément de support (4) adapté à recevoir un produit fluide, ledit élément (4) étant disposé dans l'étui (25), de sorte qu'il peut en être extrait après ouverture de sa porte d'ouverture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/04; A45D 40/00; A45D 40/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); A45D 34/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/0087 (2013.01); B65D 75/326 (2013.01); B65D 75/328 (2013.01); A45D 34/02 (2013.01); B65D 2575/3227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243199 A1 20020925; FR 2822451 A1 20020927; FR 2822451 B1 20030815

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071002

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050228

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GARCIA, FIRMIN

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUQUET, FREDERIC

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PENNANEAC'H, HERVE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI