Global Patent Index - EP 1243203 A2

EP 1243203 A2 2002-09-25 - Fastening system for slides

Title (en)

Fastening system for slides

Title (de)

Schienenmontagesystem

Title (fr)

Système de fixation pour glissières

Publication

EP 1243203 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004591 A

Priority

DE 20104933 U

Abstract (en)

The minimum distance (f) between both leg sections (14) is at least sectionally smaller than the maximum transverse distance (e) of the rail member (8) vertical to its longitudinal axis. The leg sections have at least two protrusions, which are preferably formed as pressings (3).

Abstract (de)

Schienenmontagesystem mit einem Schienenelement (8) und mindestens einem an dem Schienenelement (8) lösbar montierbaren Befestigungselement (1,7) für die Befestigung des Schienenelementes (8) an einem Korpus oder Wandelement, wobei wenigstens das Befestigungselement (1, 7) oder das Schienenelement (8) als Profilteil mit zwei Schenkelabschnitten (14) ausgebildet ist, wobei die Schenkelabschnitte (14) dieses Elements das andere Element im montierten Zustand einschließen. Um bei einem solchen Schienensystem das Aneinanderfügen von Befestigungselement und Schienenelement einfacher zu gestalten, ist der minimale Abstand (f) zwischen den beiden Schenkelabschnitten (14) zumindest abschnittsweise kleiner als die maximale Quererstreckung (e) des eingeschlossenen Elements senkrecht zu dessen Längsachse. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/43 (2017.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104933 U1 20010920; DE 50207757 D1 20060921; EP 1243203 A2 20020925; EP 1243203 A3 20040102; EP 1243203 B1 20060809

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50207757

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A47B0088040000

- IPC: A47B0088400000

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207757 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050628

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI