Global Patent Index - EP 1243213 A2

EP 1243213 A2 2002-09-25 - Shower partition

Title (en)

Shower partition

Title (de)

Duschtrennwand

Title (fr)

Cloison de douche

Publication

EP 1243213 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006079 A

Priority

DE 20104947 U

Abstract (en)

Shower separating wall comprises a holding profile (2) and an inner space (6) closed by a screen profile (4) in which a water line (8) is arranged for connection to a fitting. A rigidly fixed wall element (20) is connected to the holding profile and a tilting door profile is provided. The holding profile has a first partition (16) and a second partition (17) between which the inner space for the water line is arranged. A free space (24) is provided on the outside of the second partition in which a hinge profile (26) for the tilting door is arranged.

Abstract (de)

Eine Duschtrennwand enthält ein Halteprofil (2) und einen mittels eines Blendprofils (4) verschließbaren Innenraum (6), in welchem eine Wasserleitung (8) zum Anschluss an eine Armatur angeordnet ist, wobei mit dem Halteprofil (2) ein fest stehendes Wandelement (20) verbunden ist, und wobei ferner ein schwenkbarer Türflügel vorgesehen ist. Die Duschtrennwand soll dahingehend weiter gebildet werden, dass bei einfacher und gleichwohl funktionssicherer Konstruktion der Fertigungsaufwand reduziert wird. Hierzu wird vorgeschlagen, dass das Halteprofil (2) eine erste Querwand (16) und eine zweite Querwand (17) aufweist, zwischen welchen der Innenraum (6) für die Wasserleitung (8) angeordnet ist, und dass außen an die zweite Querwand (17) ein Freiraum (24) anschließt, in welchem ein Gelenkprofil (26) des schwenkbar gelagerten Türflügels angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01); E03C 1/0408 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1038490 A2 20000927 - ALTURA LEIDEN HOLDING [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104947 U1 20010517; EP 1243213 A2 20020925; EP 1243213 A3 20030716

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051221

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47K 3/36 A

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 03C 1/06 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI