Global Patent Index - EP 1243214 A2

EP 1243214 A2 2002-09-25 - Hinge and room divider system, in particular shower cubicle with hinge for rotatingly mounting a glass door

Title (en)

Hinge and room divider system, in particular shower cubicle with hinge for rotatingly mounting a glass door

Title (de)

Scharnier und Raumtrennvorrichtung, insbesondere Duschkabine mit Scharnier zum schwenkbaren Lagern insbesondere einer Glastür

Title (fr)

Charnière et panneau de séparation, en particulier cabine de douche avec charnière pour permettre la rotation d'une porte en verre

Publication

EP 1243214 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006440 A

Priority

DE 20105159 U

Abstract (en)

The hinge for a glass shower door has a mounting plate (12) carrying a pivot section (14) for the hinge joint. The plate is attached to the door or frame by a screw hole (40) which is formed in a sub plate (24) movable relative to the main plate. This allows positional adjustment of the hinge in a plane parallel to that of the main plate. The sub plate is locked to the main plate by friction when the screw is tightened.

Abstract (de)

Scharnier- und Duschkabine mit Scharnier zum schwenkbaren Lagern eines ersten Bauteils, insbesondere einer Glastür, an einem zweiten Bauteil, insbesondere einem Wandabschnitt einer Duschkabine, mit zwei Montageabschnitten zum Befestigen des Scharniers an dem ersten und zweiten Bauteil und einem die Montageabschnitte schwenkbar verbindenden Lager, wobei wenigstens einer der Montageabschnitte an einem Flächenabschnitt des korrespondierenden Bauteils mittels Befestigungsmitteln befestigbar ist. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin eine Duschkabine mit einem Wandabschnitt und einer mittels wenigstens einem Scharnier an dem Wandabschnitt schwenkbar gelagerten Kabinentür und wobei der Montageabschnitt ein relativ zu dem Lager und in einer im Wesentlichen zu dem Flächenabschnitt parallelen Ebene in alle Richtungen bewegbares Verstellelement aufweist, das mit den Befestigungsmitteln in Verbindung steht und das nach Fixieren der Befestigungsmittel reib- und/oder formschlüssig mit dem Montageabschnitt verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/36; E05D 5/02; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2013.01); A47K 3/36 (2013.01); E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); E05D 2005/0253 (2013.01); E05D 2005/0269 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/162 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20105159 U1 20010607; AT 455486 T 20100215; DE 50214175 D1 20100311; EP 1243214 A2 20020925; EP 1243214 A3 20051123; EP 1243214 B1 20100120; ES 2339747 T3 20100525

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180404

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: BELLERIVESTRASSE 203 POSTFACH, 8034 ZUERICH (CH)

2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160323

2017-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170427

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100322

2011-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HUEPPE GMBH

- Free text: HUEPPE GMBH#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 3#26160 BAD ZWISCHENAHN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HUEPPE GMBH#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 3#26160 BAD ZWISCHENAHN (DE)

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101021

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-10-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-08-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100520

2010-05-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2339747 T3

2010-04-28 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RENTSCH & PARTNER

2010-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214175 P 20100311

2010-03-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-01-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-01-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070326

2006-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060523

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI