Global Patent Index - EP 1243215 A2

EP 1243215 A2 2002-09-25 - Shower partition

Title (en)

Shower partition

Title (de)

Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Cloison de douche

Publication

EP 1243215 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02090035 A

Priority

DE 20104851 U

Abstract (en)

The shower separator comprises a door wing (1) with bolts (2) or bearings (3) in hinge halves (4) on the door wing. The hinges are angled and have side surfaces (5) on the rotating axes (A), which are stuck to the upper and lower edges (6,7) of the door wing. The hinge halves have a connecting surface.

Abstract (de)

Duschabtrennung mit mindestens einem an einem koaxialen Zapfen mit vertikaler Achse schwenkbaren Türflügel, bestehend aus einer rahmenlosen Platte aus Glas, Kunststoff oder dergleichen, die an ihrer oberen und unteren Kante mit einem Beschlag zum Befestigen des Türflügels versehen ist, wobei der Beschlag aus zwei durch Bolzen und Lager miteinander vereinigten Scharnierhälften besteht, wobei die dem Türflügel (1) zugeordneten, mit Bolzen (2) oder Lager (3) versehenen Scharnierhälften (4) am Türflügel (1) anklebbar angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/36; E05D 5/02; E05D 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/08 (2006.01); E05D 7/081 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01); E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); E05D 7/081 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/526 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104851 U1 20010628; AT 321482 T 20060415; DE 50206219 D1 20060518; EP 1243215 A2 20020925; EP 1243215 A3 20031105; EP 1243215 B1 20060329

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070124

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206219 P 20060518

2006-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47K 3/36 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05D 5/02 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05D 7/08 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI