Global Patent Index - EP 1243219 A2

EP 1243219 A2 2002-09-25 - Check valve for domestic appliance and method of operating a domestic appliance

Title (en)

Check valve for domestic appliance and method of operating a domestic appliance

Title (de)

Rückschlagventil für ein Hausgerät und Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Hausgeräts

Title (fr)

Soupape anti-retour pour appareil ménager et procédé de fonctionnement d'un appareil ménager

Publication

EP 1243219 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006051 A

Priority

DE 10113739 A

Abstract (en)

The non-return valve (4) is fitted in a water outlet (3,5) within the machine and can be switched into an open position in the reverse water flow direction. The device can be switched mechanically or electromagnetically and can be operated by a machine controller (7) with a detector of the position of a closure device in the machine. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of controlling a domestic machine, especially a dishwasher.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Rückschlagventil (4) in einem Wasserauslauf (3, 5) eines Hausgeräts, insbesondere einer Geschirrspülmaschine. Erfindungsgemäß ist das Rückschlagventil (4) in eine in Rücklaufrichtung des Wasserauslaufs (3, 5) geöffnete Stellung schaltbar. Dadurch fließt Klarspülflüssigkeit, die beim letzten Klarspülgang verwendet wurde, zurück in das Hausgerät, so daß diese relativ saubere Flüssigkeit für einen nächsten Spüldurchlaufbzw. Waschdurchlauf zur Verfügung steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; D06F 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/08 (2013.01); A47L 15/42 (2013.01); A47L 15/4219 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243219 A2 20020925; EP 1243219 A3 20040908; DE 10113739 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-05-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI