Global Patent Index - EP 1243242 A1

EP 1243242 A1 2002-09-25 - Dental treatment area

Title (en)

Dental treatment area

Title (de)

Zahnärztlicher Behandlungsplatz

Title (fr)

Installation de dentiste

Publication

EP 1243242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02006382 A

Priority

DE 10114316 A

Abstract (en)

An appliance (3) is freely movable in relation to a motor-driven (4) dental chair (2). A switch prevents further movement of the chair in the case of the chair and movable appliance colliding. At least one tilt sensor (7) emits a signal activating the off-switch when a pre-determined limiting value for tilt is exceeded. The treatment unit has an infra-red transmitter (8) and at least one corresponding sensor (9) for detecting the relative position of the movable appliance and dental chair.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem zahnärztlichen Behandlungsplatz (1) mit einem verstellbaren Dentalstuhl (2) sowie einem gegenüber dem Dentalstuhl (2) frei bewegbaren Gerät (3) ein Umkippen des Geräts (3) in Folge einer Kollision mit dem Dentalstuhl (2) zu vermeiden, ist eine Abschaltvorrichtung vorgesehen, durch die ein Verstellen des Dentalstuhls (2) verhindert wird. Innerhalb des bewegbaren Geräts (3) ist mindestens ein Neigungssensor (7) angeordnet, der im Falle des Überschreitens eines vorgegebenen Neigungs-Grenzwertes ein Signal zur Aktivierung der Abschaltvorrichtung erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 15/14 (2006.01); A61C 19/00 (2006.01); A61G 15/02 (2006.01); A61G 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 15/16 (2013.01); A61G 2203/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3316644 A1 19841108 - KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243242 A1 20020925; DE 10114316 A1 20020926; JP 2003000659 A 20030107

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH & CO. KG

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI