Global Patent Index - EP 1243249 B9

EP 1243249 B9 2009-02-25 - Hairdye composition containing a metallic compound based on silver salts

Title (en)

Hairdye composition containing a metallic compound based on silver salts

Title (de)

Haarfärbemittel enthaltend eine auf Silbersalzen basierende metallische Verbindung

Title (fr)

Produit pour la coloration des cheveux contenant un composé métallique à base de sels d'argent

Publication

EP 1243249 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 02006391 A

Priority

KR 20010014756 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1243249A2] A hairdye composition containing a metallic compound such as AgNO3 and C3H5AgO3 is disclosed, in which the metallic compound is mixed with a cream type composition that can be applied to hair, thereby gradually coloring gray hair. To this end, AgNO3 is composed of 0.05 SIMILAR 10.0wt% based on total weight and C3H5AgO3 is composed of 0.05 SIMILAR 10.0wt% based on total weight. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/58 (2006.01); A61K 8/19 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/39 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 5/065 (2013.01); A61K 8/19 (2013.01); A61K 8/58 (2013.01); A61K 2800/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243249 A2 20020925; EP 1243249 A3 20040204; EP 1243249 B1 20080820; EP 1243249 B9 20090225; AU 2615402 A 20020926; AU 784587 B2 20060504; DE 60228359 D1 20081002; ES 2316497 T3 20090416; JP 2002348221 A 20021204; KR 100407468 B1 20031128; KR 20020074768 A 20021004; US 2002133887 A1 20020926; US 6802872 B2 20041012

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110322

2012-04-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60228359

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-10-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1046857

2009-07-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2316497 T3

2009-03-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2008-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60228359 P 20081002

2008-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2008-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/58 20060101AFI20080218BHEP

2008-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/19 20060101ALI20080218BHEP

2008-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/10 20060101ALI20080218BHEP

2008-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/58 20060101AFI20080208BHEP

2008-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/10 20060101ALI20080208BHEP

2008-03-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HAIRDYE COMPOSITION CONTAINING A METALLIC COMPOUND BASED ON SILVER SALTS

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI