Global Patent Index - EP 1243281 A1

EP 1243281 A1 2002-09-25 - Needleless hypodermic injection system, application device and medication cartridge therefor

Title (en)

Needleless hypodermic injection system, application device and medication cartridge therefor

Title (de)

Nadelloses Subkutaninjektionssystem, Anwendungsvorrichtung und Medikamentenkartusche

Title (fr)

Système d'injection sous-cutanée sans aiguille, dispositif d'application et cartouche de médicament

Publication

EP 1243281 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02075859 A

Priority

US 27804201 P

Abstract (en)

A needleless hypodermic injection system for injecting a liquid medication, which system comprises a disposable cartridge which contains a medication and which includes a propellant and an igniter, and a reusable application device which comprises a pressure chamber for receiving the medication cartridge, actuation means including an ignition system and means for ensuring reliability and safety of the system. The reusable application device comprises: (a) a housing including a fist housing section and a second housing section which are adapted to be assembled together by a screwing operation, the first housing section comprising a front part having an injection outlet and a chamber adapted to receive a the cartridge contains the medication to be injected and also contains a propellant and an igniter, and (b) means for selectively activating said igniter of said cartridge when predetermined conditions are fulfilled. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/30; A61M 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/142 (2006.01); A61M 5/30 (2006.01); A61M 35/00 (2006.01); A61M 5/20 (2006.01); A61M 5/24 (2006.01); A61M 5/31 (2006.01); A61M 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/30 (2013.01); A61M 5/2046 (2013.01); A61M 5/2425 (2013.01); A61M 5/3129 (2013.01); A61M 5/5086 (2013.01); A61M 2005/2013 (2013.01); A61M 2005/3118 (2013.01); A61M 2005/312 (2013.01); A61M 2205/582 (2013.01); A61M 2205/583 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243281 A1 20020925; EP 1243281 B1 20050511; AR 033053 A1 20031203; AT 295192 T 20050515; AU 1885202 A 20020926; AU 768468 B2 20031211; BR 0200878 A 20031202; CA 2372319 A1 20020922; CN 1376524 A 20021030; DE 60204075 D1 20050616; DE 60204075 T2 20060202; ES 2241950 T3 20051101; JP 2002291887 A 20021008; JP 3677249 B2 20050727; KR 100506289 B1 20050805; KR 20020075220 A 20021004; MX PA02003041 A 20030714; US 2002169412 A1 20021114; US 2005131342 A1 20050616; US 6986754 B2 20060117; ZA 200200808 B 20020812

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1048960

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070305

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070306

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070306

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070305

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060303

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: F. *HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE A.G.

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070305

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070305

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070306

2006-12-13 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060306

2006-02-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-02-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-02-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2241950 T3

2005-10-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-08-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-07-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60204075 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-05-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IHLE, GUENTER FRANZ

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAAR, HANS-PETER

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEACHAM, GEORGE BEVAN KIRBY

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRUENTRUP, OTTO

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: POPP, KONRAD JOSEPH

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIEMENSPERGER, ULRICH JOSEF

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIST, HANS

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THOES, BRUNO ROBERT

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENGELHARDT, HORST

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BANDAU, DIRK

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GLIEWE, CHRISTIAN

2004-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

2004-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040308

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI