Global Patent Index - EP 1243292 A1

EP 1243292 A1 2002-09-25 - A play tunnel

Title (en)

A play tunnel

Title (de)

Spieltunnel

Title (fr)

Tunnel de jeu

Publication

EP 1243292 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02251772 A

Priority

GB 0107155 A

Abstract (en)

A play tunnel structure (11) providing passageways through which children can crawl and play. The tunnel structure (11) has loops (12) supporting a covering (14) thereby forming a tunnel passageway. The loops (12) comprise discrete rings, (16) and (18), disposed between helical members (20) and (22). When extended, the helical members, (20) and (22), form straight sections of tunnel passage way and the discrete rings, (16) and (18), may form bends in the tunnel passageway. Each discrete ring, (16) and (18), has eyes, (40) and (42), disposed to line up with each other on the outer circumference thereof. A tie (32) is threaded through the eyes, (40) and (42), and pulled taut to gather adjacent rings to thereby form and secure a bend in the passageway of the tunnel structure (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 9/00; E04H 15/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 9/00 (2006.01); E04H 15/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 9/00 (2013.01); E04H 15/40 (2013.01); A63B 2208/12 (2013.01); A63B 2210/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243292 A1 20020925; GB 0107155 D0 20010509; GB 0126605 D0 20020102; US 2003022761 A1 20030130

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041119

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021012

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI