Global Patent Index - EP 1243293 A2

EP 1243293 A2 2002-09-25 - Collapsible pogo stick

Title (en)

Collapsible pogo stick

Title (de)

Zusammenlegbare Hüpfstelze

Title (fr)

Echasse sauteuse repliable

Publication

EP 1243293 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01307850 A

Priority

CN 01208947 U

Abstract (en)

A pogo stick (10) comprising a handlebar (20), a grip portion (26), and a footrest (30) that is collapsible into a small volume for easy transportation and compact storage. The handlebar is provided with at least one elongate telescoping member, the grip portion is provided with removable grips, and the footrest is provided with pivotally mounted plates. The collapsible pogo stick incorporates a pneumatic spring of variable stiffness for accommodating users of different body weights. The pneumatic spring includes a pressure cylinder (40) and a shaft (41) extending out of the cylinder for engagement with the ground. The pneumatic spring includes a self-charging mechanism (106) such that the cylinder may be charged without the use of an external pump. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 25/08 (2013.01); A63B 2208/12 (2013.01); A63B 2210/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243293 A2 20020925; EP 1243293 A3 20040102; CN 2468527 Y 20020102

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-10-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63B 25/08 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63B 21/008 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63B 21/02 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI