Global Patent Index - EP 1243313 A2

EP 1243313 A2 2002-09-25 - Device and method for mixing a gas with a liquid or a liquid with a liquid

Title (en)

Device and method for mixing a gas with a liquid or a liquid with a liquid

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Mischen eines Gases mit einer Flüssigkeit oder einer Flüssigkeit mit einer Flüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour mélanger un gaz avec un liquide ou un liquide avec un liquide

Publication

EP 1243313 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02006458 A

Priority

IT PC20010014 A

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a method for mixing a gas with a liquid or a liquid with a liquid, and a device designed to implement the said method. <??>The said device comprises a propeller (1) which contains a channel that places the upper surface of the blades (4) in communication with the environment containing a gas or liquid to be mixed with a liquid. The said device draws the gas, such as air, from the external environment (or a liquid) using the negative pressure generated on the upper surface of the propeller blades immersed in the liquid, such as water, when the propeller is rotated, the said negative pressure being sufficient to suck in the said air. The air thus aspirated will mix effectively with the liquid mass due to the effect of the vortex caused by the rotating propeller, which breaks up the air into a myriad of bubbles, thus greatly increasing the exchange surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/04; B01F 3/08; B01F 13/02; B01F 15/00; C02F 3/20; C12M 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00341 (2013.01); B01F 3/04539 (2013.01); B01F 3/0857 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243313 A2 20020925; EP 1243313 A3 20040901; IT PC20010014 A1 20020923

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050402

2005-06-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 3/04 A

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 3/08 B

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 15/00 B

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 13/02 B

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 02F 3/20 B

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12M 1/06 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI