Global Patent Index - EP 1243337 A2

EP 1243337 A2 2002-09-25 - Drive assembly for tube mill

Title (en)

Drive assembly for tube mill

Title (de)

Antriebseinrichtung für eine Rohrmühle

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour broyeur tubulaire

Publication

EP 1243337 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005572 A

Priority

DE 10114294 A

Abstract (en)

Drive device for a tube mill comprises a drive wheel (15) having a diameter smaller than or equal to the diameter of a rotating grinding tube (10) and fixed to the smaller diameter of a truncated discharge cone (11) closed by an end wall (14) at its smaller diameter and having discharge openings (12) distributed along its periphery. Preferred Features: The drive wheel is a one-piece toothed ring in which at least one drive pinion (16) engages in the tooth profile.

Abstract (de)

Um für eine Rohrmühle eine einfach und kompakt gebaute Antriebseinrichtung zu schaffen, deren Kraftübertragung durch Durchbiegungen und andere Verformungen des Mahlrohres nicht mehr gefährdet ist, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, am kleinen Durchmesser des am Mahlgutaustragsende angesetzten Austragskonusses (11) des Mahlrohres (10) ein Antriebsrad (15) insbesondere in Gestalt eines einteiligen Zahnkranzes anzuflanschen mit einem Durchmesser <= (kleiner/gleich) dem Mahlrohrdurchmeser. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 17/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/18 (2006.01); B02C 17/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243337 A2 20020925; EP 1243337 A3 20030507; EP 1243337 B1 20060531; CZ 20021040 A3 20021113; CZ 295484 B6 20050817; DE 10114294 A1 20020926; DE 50206950 D1 20060706; US 2002158157 A1 20021031; US 6655617 B2 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50206950

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206950 P 20060706

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2005-07-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG GMBH

2005-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI