Global Patent Index - EP 1243343 A1

EP 1243343 A1 2002-09-25 - Dual fluid spray nozzle

Title (en)

Dual fluid spray nozzle

Title (de)

Zweistoffsprühdüse

Title (fr)

Buse de vaporisation à deux fluides

Publication

EP 1243343 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01106427 A

Priority

EP 01106427 A

Abstract (en)

Two material spray nozzle comprises a housing (1) with a mixing chamber (2) and connecting channels (3, 5) for the supply of a gaseous and a liquid medium; and a mouthpiece (6) having a bore (8) and an outlet opening (9). A twisted insert (11) is arranged in the bore of the mouthpiece and the outlet opening is provided centrally on the base (8a) of the mouthpiece with a diameter corresponding to half the diameter of the bore. Preferred Features: The outlet opening extends to a outlet cone (10) whose outlet angle ( alpha ) adapts to the desired spray angle. The part of the base surrounding the outlet opening is planar or directed at right angles to the axis of the bore.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Zweistoffsprühdüse beschrieben, die mit einer in einem Gehäuse (1) angeordneten Mischkammer (2) und mit je einem in diese mündenden Anschlusskanal (3, 5) für die Zufuhr eines gasförmigen und eines flüssigen Mediums versehen ist. Der Mischkammer (2) ist dabei ein Mundstück (6) nachgeschaltet, in dem eine rotationssymmetrische mittige Austrittsöffnung (9) vorgesehen ist. In der Bohrung (8) des Mundstückes (6) ist ein Dralleinsatz (11) angeordnet und die Austrittsöffnung (9) besitzt einen Durchmesser, der höchstens der Hälfte des Durchmessers der Bohrung (8) des Mundstückes entspricht. Eine solche Zweistoffsprühdüse ist verstopfungsunempfindlich und eignet sich besonders zum Zerstäuben niedrigviskoser Flüssigkeiten für die Kühlung in Stranggussanlagen zur Stahlherstellung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/10; B05B 1/34; B22D 11/124

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/10 (2006.01); B05B 7/32 (2006.01); B22D 11/124 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/0483 (2013.01); B05B 7/10 (2013.01); B22D 11/1246 (2013.01); B05B 1/3421 (2013.01); B05B 1/3447 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243343 A1 20020925; EP 1243343 B1 20030813; AT 246962 T 20030815; DE 50100495 D1 20030918; ES 2204774 T3 20040501; JP 2002346711 A 20021204; JP 3715579 B2 20051109; US 2002134862 A1 20020926; US 6705538 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204774 T3

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100495 P 20030918

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LECHLER GMBH

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020921

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI