Global Patent Index - EP 1243344 A1

EP 1243344 A1 2002-09-25 - Dispensing device such as a pump or a valve

Title (en)

Dispensing device such as a pump or a valve

Title (de)

Abgabevorrichtung wie eine Pumpe oder ein Ventil

Title (fr)

Organe de distribution tel qu'une pompe ou une valve

Publication

EP 1243344 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290652 A

Priority

FR 0103891 A

Abstract (en)

The distributor pump or valve has a housing (2) containing a sliding piston (3) and which receives a ferrule (4). Fixings (5) have a peripheral profile (53) which extends radially outwardly to engage in a recess (82) in an inner wall (81) of a neck (80) of a container. The profile is elastically movable radially inwardly to fit into the collar recess and radially deform the housing into a displacement zone. The ferrule is out of contact with the housing at the area of deformation of the housing. Claims include method of fixing valve or pump

Abstract (fr)

Organe de distribution, tel qu'une pompe ou une valve, comprenant : un corps (2) dans lequel coulisse un piston (3) et dans lequel est engagée une virole (4), et des moyens de fixation (5) comprenant au moins un profil périphérique (53) qui fait saillie radialement vers l'extérieur, ledit profil saillant (53) étant destiné à venir se loger dans un évidement (82) formé dans une paroi interne (81) d'un col (80) de récipient (8), ledit profil saillant (53) étant déplaçable élastiquement radialement vers l'intérieur pour venir se loger dans l'évidement (82) du col en déformant élastiquement le corps (2) radialement vers l'intérieur dans une zone de déplacement (200), caractérisé en ce que la virole (4) est hors de contact du corps au niveau de la zone de déformation (200) du corps (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3049 (2013.01); B05B 11/0013 (2013.01); B05B 11/3015 (2013.01); B05B 11/3022 (2013.01); B05B 11/304 (2013.01); B05B 11/307 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2792295 A1 20001020 - VALOIS SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243344 A1 20020925; FR 2822448 A1 20020927; FR 2822448 B1 20031003

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071002

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI