Global Patent Index - EP 1243348 A1

EP 1243348 A1 2002-09-25 - Sorting device

Title (en)

Sorting device

Title (de)

Sortiereinrichtung nach Durchmesser

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tri

Publication

EP 1243348 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01250103 A

Priority

EP 01250103 A

Abstract (en)

The machine consists of pairs of pulley-like sorting plates (2) fastened parallel to a driven shaft (3). An oscillating conveyor (4) has a corrugated oscillating table (5) for pre-sorting and supply of goods (6) in rows to the plates. Goods sorted dependent upon diameter are moved into collection channels (7), and these act with conveyor belts (8) leading to transport crates. The plates have clamping areas (10) of different diameters, with elastic lips to protect the goods.

Abstract (de)

Eine Sortiereinrichtung(1) besteht aus nebeneinander auf einer Antriebswelle(3) drehenden Tellerpaaren(2),der speziellen Sortiergutbeschickung(4) und den Entsorgungs-Auffangrinnen(7) für das sortierte Fördergut(6). Die Sortiergutbeschickung (4,5) bildet mittels Längsbarrieren bereits Sortiergetreihen (im Gänsemarsch) zwecks liniengerechter Zuführung zwischen die Tellerpaare(2). Das Sortiergut wird am höchsten Punkt der Tellerscheiben aufgegeben,fällt zwischen die Tellerscheiben(2) bis zum größenabhängigen Klemmpunkt(10),wird auf dem sortierenden Klemmradius(11) durch die Wellen/Tellerdrehung um ca 90° gefördert und löst sich schwerkraftbedingt amAbfallpunkt(12),wird dort von den Auffangrinnen(7) übernommen und weitergeleitet über Entsorgungsförderer(8) in Transportkisten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243348 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030110

- Countries: AL

2003-06-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030110

- Countries: LT

2003-06-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030110

- Countries: LV

2003-06-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030110

- Countries: MK

2003-06-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030110

- Countries: RO

2003-06-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030110

- Countries: SI

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI